NJ A4042 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S2656 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S2656 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates State Highway Route 15 in Sussex County as "Senator Robert E. Littell Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates State Highway Route 15 in Sussex County as "Senator Robert E. Littell Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Michael Carroll [R] | Rep. Scott Rumana [R] |
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Substituted by S2656 (1R) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2656 (Same As) 2015-05-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.58.