NJ A4044 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-5)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-5)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits non-disclosure clauses in certain contracts.
Title
Prohibits non-disclosure clauses in certain contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3574 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-5) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S3574 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-8-1) |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3574 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4044