NJ A4058 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2956
Note: Carry Over of previous A4468
Note: Carry Over of previous A4468
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates and preserves Caven Point Peninsula in Liberty State Park as natural habitat.
Title
Designates and preserves Caven Point Peninsula in Liberty State Park as natural habitat.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S289 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2956 (Carry Over) 2022-08-08 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4468 (Carry Over) 2022-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S2956 (Carry Over) 2022-08-08 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4468 (Carry Over) 2022-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4058 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4500/4058_I1.HTM |