NJ A4092 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Spencer)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Spencer)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Local Hospital Fee Pilot Program Act"*
Title
"Local Hospital Fee Pilot Program Act"*
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Spencer) |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2466 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A4092 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4500/4092_I1.HTM |