NJ A4107 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on October 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Approved P.L.2022, c.118.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on October 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Approved P.L.2022, c.118.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes concerning regulation of emergency medical services; establishes mobile integrated health program and new State Emergency Medical Services Director in DOH.
Title
Makes various changes concerning regulation of emergency medical services; establishes mobile integrated health program and new State Emergency Medical Services Director in DOH.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2768 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2768 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.118. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2022-10-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-1-0) |
2022-09-15 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2022-09-15 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2022-09-15 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2768 (2R) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-2-0) |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2768 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A4107 (2R)