NJ A4120 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reporting of the graduation and transfer rates of State tuition aid grant recipients.*
Title
Requires reporting of the graduation and transfer rates of State tuition aid grant recipients.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-2-1) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wilson) |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2649 (Same As) 2013-08-19 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading