NJ A4172 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1106
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns timely provision of TDI and family temporary disability benefits.*
Title
Concerns timely provision of TDI and family temporary disability benefits.*
Sponsors
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] |
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (64-6-3) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Assembly Substitution (Lagana) |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4172 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2561 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2561 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee