NJ A4201 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defers ambulatory care facility gross receipts assessment payment due on June 15, 2020 by 90 days.
Title
Defers ambulatory care facility gross receipts assessment payment due on June 15, 2020 by 90 days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2541 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee