NJ A4253 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2004
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.454.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.454.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain electronic medical programs to include demographic data entry feature; requires laboratories to record certain patients' demographic information; requires certain hospitals and laboratories to implement cultural competency training program.
Title
Requires certain electronic medical programs to include demographic data entry feature; requires laboratories to record certain patients' demographic information; requires certain hospitals and laboratories to implement cultural competency training program.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] |
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3233 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3233 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.454. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-1) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Concur by Assembly Amendments (69-6-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-7) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S3233 (2R) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Cryan) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-1-5) |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4253 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.454.
S3233 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A4253 (ACS/3R)
S3233 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A4253 (ACS/3R)