NJ A4260 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3128
Note: Carry Foward to future S3205
Note: Carry Over of previous A357
Note: Carry Over of previous S2488
Note: Carry Over of previous S2115
Note: Carry Foward to future S3205
Note: Carry Over of previous A357
Note: Carry Over of previous S2488
Note: Carry Over of previous S2115
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tuition benefits at public institutions of higher education to New Jersey residents who are members of reserve component of Armed Forces of United States.
Title
Provides tuition benefits at public institutions of higher education to New Jersey residents who are members of reserve component of Armed Forces of United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4260 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4260 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A357 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2488 (Carry Over) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2115 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A4260 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A357 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2488 (Carry Over) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2115 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A4260 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4500/4260_I1.HTM |