NJ A4265 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2845
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipal, county, and regional police and fire forces to establish five-year residency requirement for police officers and firefighters; allows exceptions to requirement under certain circumstances.**
Title
Permits municipal, county, and regional police and fire forces to establish five-year residency requirement for police officers and firefighters; allows exceptions to requirement under certain circumstances.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2783 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2783 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2783 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-14) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for S2783 (1R) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (41-33-4) |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jasey) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4265 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S2783 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A4265 (2R)
S2783 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A4265 (2R)