NJ A4265 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1412
Note: Carry Over of previous S2425
Note: Carry Over of previous A3851
Note: Carry Over of previous S2425
Note: Carry Over of previous A3851
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S2261 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S2261 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law relating to common interest communities.
Title
Revises law relating to common interest communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S2261 (1R) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4265 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S2261 (1R)
S2261 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
S2425 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2842 (Same As) 2020-11-18 - Approved P.L.2020, c.124.
A3851 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2425 (2R)
S2261 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
S2425 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2842 (Same As) 2020-11-18 - Approved P.L.2020, c.124.
A3851 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2425 (2R)