NJ A4267 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S758
Note: Carry Over of previous S1991
Note: Carry Over of previous A2304
Note: Carry Over of previous S1991
Note: Carry Over of previous A2304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Re-establishes Arthritis Quality of Life Initiative and Advisory Council on Arthritis in DHS.
Title
Re-establishes Arthritis Quality of Life Initiative and Advisory Council on Arthritis in DHS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4267 (Carry Over) 2022-06-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S409 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1991 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2304 (Carry Over) 2021-01-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S409 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1991 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2304 (Carry Over) 2021-01-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A4267 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A4500/4267_I1.HTM |