NJ A4274 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S2525 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S2525 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands powers and duties of State Chief Diversity Officer to promote diversity in State government and public contracting.
Title
Expands powers and duties of State Chief Diversity Officer to promote diversity in State government and public contracting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S2525 (1R) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2525 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate