NJ A4292 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1798
Note: Carry Foward to future S2279
Note: Carry Foward to future S2279
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S2841 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S2841 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raises minimum amount of liability coverage for commercial motor vehicles and autocabs.
Title
Raises minimum amount of liability coverage for commercial motor vehicles and autocabs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-04 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S2841 (2R) |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4292 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S2841 (2R)
A4292 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S2841 (2R)
S2841 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.276.
A4292 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S2841 (2R)
S2841 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.276.