NJ A4332 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-13)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-13)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Back to Work NJ Program"; makes an appropriation.
Title
Establishes "Back to Work NJ Program"; makes an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-13) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for S3080 (1R) | |
2011-12-08 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-12-05 | Passed by the Assembly (47-32-0) | |
2011-12-01 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-11-28 | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-11-21 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3080 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Substituted by A4332 (1R)