NJ A4354 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3255
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employees of private entity with access to student information under contract with DOE, school districts, or charter schools to undergo criminal background check.
Title
Requires employees of private entity with access to student information under contract with DOE, school districts, or charter schools to undergo criminal background check.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-8-15) |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4354 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2921 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2921 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee