NJ A4359 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3305
Note: Carry Over of previous A5387
Note: Carry Over of previous A5387
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU to allow low- and moderate-income residential customers to self-attest to income for participation in community solar programs.
Title
Requires BPU to allow low- and moderate-income residential customers to self-attest to income for participation in community solar programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S242 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S3305 (Carry Over) 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5387 (Carry Over) 2023-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S3305 (Carry Over) 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5387 (Carry Over) 2023-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4359 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4500/4359_I1.HTM |