NJ A4366 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S764
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.455.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.455.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Police Training Commission to contract with crisis intervention training center to provide mental health training to police officers and establish curriculum specific to persons experiencing economic crisis or substance use disorder.
Title
Requires Police Training Commission to contract with crisis intervention training center to provide mental health training to police officers and establish curriculum specific to persons experiencing economic crisis or substance use disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2801 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2801 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.455. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S2801 (1R) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Pou) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4366 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.455.
S2801 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4366 (2R)
S2801 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A4366 (2R)