NJ A4366 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S2905 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S2905 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definition of destructive device to include certain .50 caliber rifles; makes certain exceptions.
Title
Revises definition of destructive device to include certain .50 caliber rifles; makes certain exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2905 (1R) |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2905 (Same As) 2022-07-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.54.