NJ A4401 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.175.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.175.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain benefits for certain family members of military personnel who died while on active duty.
Title
Authorizes certain benefits for certain family members of military personnel who died while on active duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2854 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.175. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2854 (2R) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2854 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4401 (2R)