NJ A4410 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2444
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires online parking ticket payment system, NJMCDirect, to process payments 24 hours per day.
Title
Requires online parking ticket payment system, NJMCDirect, to process payments 24 hours per day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2015-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-22 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4410 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee