NJ A4426 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2175
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Linnette Lebron's Law" modifies procedures for marriage or civil union where a party is terminally ill.*
Title
"Linnette Lebron's Law" modifies procedures for marriage or civil union where a party is terminally ill.*
Sponsors
Rep. Angel Fuentes [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Rep. David Wolfe [R] |
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4426 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2996 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2996 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee