NJ A4444 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2992
Note: Carry Foward to future A4176
Note: Carry Over of previous S554
Note: Carry Over of previous A1703
Note: Carry Foward to future A4176
Note: Carry Over of previous S554
Note: Carry Over of previous A1703
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades certain types of assault against sports officials to aggravated assault.
Title
Upgrades certain types of assault against sports officials to aggravated assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-3-2) |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2023-01-19 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4444 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4444 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S709 (Same As) 2023-12-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S554 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1703 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4444 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S709 (Same As) 2023-12-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S554 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1703 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee