NJ A4448 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2083
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes fourth degree crime of cyber-interference.*
Title
Establishes fourth degree crime of cyber-interference.*
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4448 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
S3003 (Same As) 2018-09-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3003 (Same As) 2018-09-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee