NJ A4453 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S718
Note: Carry Foward to future A418
Note: Carry Foward to future A418
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes failure to wear mask upon entry into store or transportation publically available, with posted signage, a violation with fine during public emergency declared in Executive Order 103 of 2020 and future public health emergencies.
Title
Makes failure to wear mask upon entry into store or transportation publically available, with posted signage, a violation with fine during public emergency declared in Executive Order 103 of 2020 and future public health emergencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4453 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A4453 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S2814 (Same As) 2020-08-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4453 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S2814 (Same As) 2020-08-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee