NJ A4498 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Substituted by S3205 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Substituted by S3205 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises expungement eligibility and procedures. *
Title
Revises expungement eligibility and procedures. *
Sponsors
Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S3205 (2R) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3205 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate