NJ A4530 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (75-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (75-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows sentencing to extended term for repeat convictions of receipt of stolen property.
Title
Allows sentencing to extended term for repeat convictions of receipt of stolen property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-1-0) |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3430 (Same As) 2024-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee