NJ A4547 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2102
Note: Carry Foward to future S1040
Note: Carry Foward to future S1040
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts community gardens operating on-site composting systems or other systems of managing organic waste from certain DEP permits under certain conditions.
Title
Exempts community gardens operating on-site composting systems or other systems of managing organic waste from certain DEP permits under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4547 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4547 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3154 (Same As) 2022-11-03 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4547 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3154 (Same As) 2022-11-03 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading