NJ A4588 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A705
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJTA to implement certain roadside maintenance safety policies.
Title
Requires NJTA to implement certain roadside maintenance safety policies.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S1246 |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4588 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1246
S1246 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
S1246 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate