NJ A4599 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1559
Note: Carry Foward to future S837
Note: Carry Over of previous A3492
Note: Carry Over of previous S2946
Note: Carry Foward to future S837
Note: Carry Over of previous A3492
Note: Carry Over of previous S2946
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to study technology and other methods used to reduce or eliminate telemarketing harassment and intimidation.
Title
Establishes task force to study technology and other methods used to reduce or eliminate telemarketing harassment and intimidation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4599 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A4599 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1858 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3492 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2946 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A4599 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1858 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3492 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2946 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A4599 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A5000/4599_I1.HTM |