NJ A4617 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1472
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Addresses certain landlord expenses in response to COVID-19 pandemic; appropriates $300 million.
Title
Addresses certain landlord expenses in response to COVID-19 pandemic; appropriates $300 million.
Sponsors
Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] |
Rep. William Spearman [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Robert Clifton [R] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4617 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3357 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Stack)
S3357 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Stack)