NJ A4624 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3914
Note: Carry Over of previous A5562
Note: Carry Over of previous A5562
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric public utilities to submit new tariffs for commercial customers for BPU approval; regulates non-volumetric electricity fees charged to operators of fast charging electric vehicle chargers.
Title
Requires electric public utilities to submit new tariffs for commercial customers for BPU approval; regulates non-volumetric electricity fees charged to operators of fast charging electric vehicle chargers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S256 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S3914 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A5562 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S3914 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A5562 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4624 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A5000/4624_I1.HTM |