NJ A4635 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2977
Note: Carry Over of previous A4161
Note: Carry Over of previous A4161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S844/2533 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S844/2533 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises financial reporting requirements for charitable organizations; excludes non-monetary in-kind donations from gross revenue for purpose of reporting requirements.
Title
Revises financial reporting requirements for charitable organizations; excludes non-monetary in-kind donations from gross revenue for purpose of reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S844/2533 (SCS/1R) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S844 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.381.
S2977 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2533 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Combined with S844 (SCS)
A4161 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2977 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2533 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Combined with S844 (SCS)
A4161 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee