NJ A4682 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3118 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3118 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes public awareness campaign to promote early conversations about advance care planning and end-of-life care.
Title
Establishes public awareness campaign to promote early conversations about advance care planning and end-of-life care.
Sponsors
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S3118 (1R) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3118 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.315.