NJ A4699 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.488.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.488.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates annual report filing services.
Title
Regulates annual report filing services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2938 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2938 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.488. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2938 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Turner) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-1) |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2938 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4699 (1R)