NJ A4712 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2187
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2957 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2957 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes five-year moratorium on conversions of certain residential rental premises in qualified counties.
Title
Establishes five-year moratorium on conversions of certain residential rental premises in qualified counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S2957 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4712 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2957 (1R)
S2957 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2957 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session