NJ A4756 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Passed by the Assembly (53-15-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Passed by the Assembly (53-15-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Transparency, Responsibility, and Accountability for New Surcharges and Increases in Ticketing (T.R.A.N.S.I.T.) Act"; increases number of public hearings NJT is required to hold prior and subsequent to fare increase or change or abandonment of service.
Title
"Transparency, Responsibility, and Accountability for New Surcharges and Increases in Ticketing (T.R.A.N.S.I.T.) Act"; increases number of public hearings NJT is required to hold prior and subsequent to fare increase or change or abandonment of service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-15-6) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3178 (Same As) 2015-10-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee