NJ A4787 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A809
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes alternate members for farmers on State Agriculture Development Committee.
Title
Authorizes alternate members for farmers on State Agriculture Development Committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3285 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3285 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S3285 (1R) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4787 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-0)
S3285 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4787 (1R)
S3285 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4787 (1R)