NJ A4790 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S3220 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S3220 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a process to integrate certain health data and other data from publicly supported programs for population health research.*
Title
Establishes a process to integrate certain health data and other data from publicly supported programs for population health research.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S3220 (1R) |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3220 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.193.