NJ A4808 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1982
Note: Carry Foward to future A3280
Note: Carry Foward to future A3280
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes office in EDA to assist in provision and expansion of broadband Internet service in State to address inequities in accessing broadband service.
Title
Establishes office in EDA to assist in provision and expansion of broadband Internet service in State to address inequities in accessing broadband service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-1) |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4808 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4808 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3086 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4808 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3086 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee