NJ A4841 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.35.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.35.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends transmittal date deadline for fiscal year 2019-2020 gubernatorial budget message to Legislature from fourth Tuesday in February to March 5, 2019.
Title
Extends transmittal date deadline for fiscal year 2019-2020 gubernatorial budget message to Legislature from fourth Tuesday in February to March 5, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3292 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3292 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.35. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Substituted for S3292 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S3292 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A4841