NJ A4907 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.142.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.142.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriation of $58,000,000 for NJ Statewide Body Worn Camera Program.
Title
Makes supplemental appropriation of $58,000,000 for NJ Statewide Body Worn Camera Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3089 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3089 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.142. |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-4-9) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S3089 (SCS/1R) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Cryan) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-5-8) |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3089 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4907 (ACS/1R)