NJ A5053 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1366
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.21.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.21.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY2021 to include new projects and modify estimated loan amounts for certain projects; modifies terms and conditions for certain loans utilizing federal funds.
Title
Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY2021 to include new projects and modify estimated loan amounts for certain projects; modifies terms and conditions for certain loans utilizing federal funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3212 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.21. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S3212 |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5053 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.21.
S3212 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A5053
S3212 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A5053