NJ A5070 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.289.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.289.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain municipalities to impose parking taxes to fund projects to improve pedestrian access to mass transit.
Title
Authorizes certain municipalities to impose parking taxes to fund projects to improve pedestrian access to mass transit.
Sponsors
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3507 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3507 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.289. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (42-23-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-16) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted for S3507 (1R) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (41-33-0) |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3507 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5070 (1R)