NJ A5122 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by S3220 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by S3220 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits exemption from civil service law enforcement examination requirement for entry level-law enforcement officers.
Title
Permits exemption from civil service law enforcement examination requirement for entry level-law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Rep. William Spearman [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Erik Simonsen [R] |
Rep. Antwan McClellan [R] | Sen. Jean Stanfield [R] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S3220 (1R) |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3220 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.7.