NJ A5147 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Alleviating Learning Loss in New Jersey Grant Program in DOE to assist public schools in establishing or expanding certain educational programs to address learning loss in students.
Title
Establishes Alleviating Learning Loss in New Jersey Grant Program in DOE to assist public schools in establishing or expanding certain educational programs to address learning loss in students.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3479 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee