NJ A5306 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4488
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain voters residing overseas to vote in certain elections in this State depending on overseas residency or intent to return.
Title
Allows certain voters residing overseas to vote in certain elections in this State depending on overseas residency or intent to return.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3761 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3761 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-15) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3761 (1R) |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-25-1) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4488 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3761 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5306 (2R)
S3761 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5306 (2R)