NJ A5381 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1189
Note: Carry Foward to future S1372
Note: Carry Foward to future S1372
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Cunningham)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Cunningham)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires financial aid award letter provided by institutions of higher education and certain proprietary schools be consistent with financial aid shopping sheet.
Title
Requires financial aid award letter provided by institutions of higher education and certain proprietary schools be consistent with financial aid shopping sheet.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Cunningham) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5381 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Cunningham)
A5381 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Cunningham)
S3536 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (31-0) (Cunningham)
A5381 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Cunningham)
S3536 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (31-0) (Cunningham)