NJ A5452 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A5030
Note: Carry Foward to future S2169
Note: Carry Foward to future S2169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that firearms purchaser identification card is valid for four years; requires training prior to issuance of firearms cards and handgun purchase permits; revises procedures for passing of firearms to heir or legatee.
Title
Provides that firearms purchaser identification card is valid for four years; requires training prior to issuance of firearms cards and handgun purchase permits; revises procedures for passing of firearms to heir or legatee.
Sponsors
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (45-24-5) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5452 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5452 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3876 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5452 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3876 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee